Hill v. Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation
Plaintiff: Raymecus Hill
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01296
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation.(Irons, Pamela)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #7 MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/22/20. (mbm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Consultation)(Irons, Pamela)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3243334), filed by Raymecus Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Janney, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Pamela R. Irons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymecus Hill
Represented By: Douglas B. Janney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?