R.W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Pam Carter
Case Number: 1:2019cv02295
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 Defendants ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(Box, Bradford)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 8/10/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 1:15 PM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/27/2020. (ejc)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 9/5/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Discovery due by 3/3/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/12/2019. Motions due by 4/2/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/13/2019. (ars)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. Court amended ADR deadline - parties agree order to be entered as copy presented in court. (Court Reporter FTR.) (skp)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Owners Insurance Company, filed by R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Scott, Clinton)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #15 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/11/19. (mbm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Consultation)(Scott, Clinton)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) (Scott, Clinton)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Mediator by R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc.. (Scott, Clinton)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Scott, Clinton)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Box, Bradford)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford David Box on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Box, Bradford)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 06/13/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton H. Scott on behalf of R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc. (Scott, Clinton)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Bobbitt on behalf of R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc. (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE to all parties: Pursuant to the Transfer of Jurisdiction to the Eastern Division, the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex. 1:XX-cv-XXXXor 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleadings to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) case. The new case number is 1:19-cv-2295. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld) Modified on 5/9/2019 to add Judge's Card (skc).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company. (Mansfield, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Chancery Court of Madison County, case number 77393 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3061356), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mansfield, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. Mansfield
Represented By: Bradford David Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. W. Hicks Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Pam Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?