Greer v. Koch Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Greer
Defendant: Koch Business Solutions, LP, SRG Global Coatings, Inc. and Koch Industries, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Court Clerk Tom TJ Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv02513
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by SRG Global Coatings, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Perry, Gadson)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Jimmie Greer OF SERVICE OF PLTF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Barnes, Spencer)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by SRG Global Coatings, Inc. of Intent to Challenge the Reasonableness of Plaintiff's Medical Expenses (Perry, Gadson)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by SRG Global Coatings, Inc. of Selection of Mediator (Amended Joint Notice) (Perry, Gadson)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by SRG Global Coatings, Inc. of Selection of Mediator (Joint Notice) (Perry, Gadson)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Bench Trial set for 1/25/2021 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2021. (mbb) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/13/2019) (mbb).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/12/2019. (mbb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 9/12/2019. Parties addressed the Court. ADR by 12/27/19. Discovery by 6/26/20. Dispositive motions by 8/28/20. No mediator selected. Parties given 10 days to select mediator and file a notice with the Court of selection. Estimated 2-3 day Non-Jury Trial. Court to enter scheduling order. Parties do not consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. PRESENT: Terri Crider for plaintiff. Will Perry for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Perry, Gadson)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:15 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SRG Global Coatings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SRG Global, Inc. for SRG Global Coatings, Inc... (Perry, Gadson)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by SRG Global Coatings, Inc..(Perry, Gadson)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc., SRG Global Coatings, Inc.. (Perry, Gadson)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 7, 2019 Note to all parties. This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It will be transferred to the Jackson office and the case number will be modified. Please take notice of the case number as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. The old case will be close and contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filings of future pleadings in the correct (open) case. The case number is 1:19cv2513 STA/jay. (jae)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae) Modified on 8/7/2019 to add Judge's Card (skc).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SRG Global Coatings, Inc., Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. from Circuit Court of Dyer County, Tennessee, case number 2019-cv-64 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3134153), filed by SRG Global Coatings, Inc., Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Gadson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Koch Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Greer
Represented By: Spencer Robert Barnes
Represented By: Terri Smith Crider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Business Solutions, LP
Represented By: Gadson William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Global Coatings, Inc.
Represented By: Gadson William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gadson William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Court Clerk Tom TJ Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?