Nicky Dunn d/b/a 3D's Properties,LLC
Plaintiff: Nicky Dunn d/b/a 3D's Properties,LLC and Nicky Dunn
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01006
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 Please disregard filing at DE #11 - filed in wrong case number. (skp)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 Disregard filing - entered in wrong case - per 3/3/2020 helpdesk email from S. Barrett. Modified on 3/3/2020 (skp).
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Correction to #2 Notice of Correction of Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Songstad, Randall)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Correction to #2 Notice of Correction Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Songstad, Randall)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Summons by Randall N Songstad on behalf of Nicky Dunn d/b/a 3D's Properties,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Songstad, Randall)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Songstad, Randall)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, LLC, (Filing fee of $400 receipt number ATNWDC-3252874) filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Songstad, Randall) Modified on 1/8/2020 to reflect internet payment(mbm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicky Dunn d/b/a 3D's Properties,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicky Dunn d/b/a 3D's Properties,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicky Dunn
Represented By: Randall N Songstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?