Newsome v. United States of America
Petitioner: Robert Newsome
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01050
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Kitchen, Jerry)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Kitchen, Jerry)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/16/20. (skc)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/16/20. (skc)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed order by United States of America. (Kitchen, Jerry)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/31/2020. (mbm)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/31/2020. (mbm)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Kitchen, Jerry)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Release of Attorney Client Privilege proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Kitchen, Jerry)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND TO 2255 PETITION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/10/2020. (mbm)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry R. Kitchen on behalf of United States of America (Kitchen, Jerry)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 USC 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody filed by Robert Newsome. (Attachments: #1 cover ltr, #2 envelope, #3 Judge's Card)(skc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsome v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA - Jackson
Represented By: Jerry R. Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?