McAdams v. Ivey
Plaintiff: Kevin McAdams
Defendant: Roger Ivey
Case Number: 1:2020cv01128
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 09:30 AM before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2021 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2021. (mbb)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/6/2020. (mbb) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/6/2020) (mbb).
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Skype Video Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2020. ADR by 10/29/20. Discovery by 4/14/21. Dispositive motions by 5/14/2021. Mediator: John Burleson. Estimated 2 day jury trial. Parties do not consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. PRESENT: Leanne Thorne for plaintiff. Meghan Murphy for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION as to Mediation by Roger Ivey. (Murphy, Meghan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Murphy, Meghan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Maurice Bryson at Maurice_Bryson@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 09:15 AM before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Roger Ivey.(Murphy, Meghan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin McAdams as to Roger Ivey. (Thorne, Leanne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roger Ivey. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3366424), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Roger Ivey)(Thorne, Leanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAdams v. Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McAdams
Represented By: Leanne A. Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Ivey
Represented By: Meghan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?