Reed's Metals, LLC v. Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Reed's Metals, LLC
Defendant: Ricky Fisher, Samuel Carroll, Joanna Carroll, Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC and Alaina McCall
Case Number: 1:2020cv01164
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/11/2020. (mbm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC, Joanna Carroll, Samuel Carroll, Alaina McCall. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Burleson, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Reed's Metals, LLC. Alaina McCall waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (McDowell, Martin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Reed's Metals, LLC. Joanna Carroll waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (McDowell, Martin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Reed's Metals, LLC. Samuel Carroll waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (McDowell, Martin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Reed's Metals, LLC. Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (McDowell, Martin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Courtner on behalf of Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC, Joanna Carroll, Samuel Carroll, Alaina McCall (Courtner, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Burleson on behalf of Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC, Joanna Carroll, Samuel Carroll, Alaina McCall (Burleson, John)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint by Reed's Metals, LLC.. (McDowell, Martin)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Reed's Metals, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Your Complaint doesn't have a civil cover sheet attached. Per LR 3.1, "Every complaint or other document initiating or removing a civil action or proceeding, except pro se cases, shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet. The civil cover sheet shall be submitted as a Form JS-44 obtained from the Clerk or from the Courts website, www.tnwd.uscourts.gov." Please file one using the event "Attachment" and link it back to DE#1 . Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mbm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reed's Metals, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3398260), filed by Reed's Metals, LLC.(McDowell, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed's Metals, LLC v. Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Carroll
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Carroll
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Steel Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaina McCall
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed's Metals, LLC
Represented By: Martin Patrick McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?