Deschler v. FCA US LLC/RAM et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Joseph Deschler
Defendant: Helms Motor Co., Inc. and FCA US LLC/RAM
Case Number: 1:2020cv01167
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: J Daniel Breen
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 12/22/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020. Discovery due by 5/10/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020. Motions due by 6/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/29/2020. (ars)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2020. Present were pro se ptf and attys Hickman and Phillips. Atty Talley was excused from call as his client filed notice of dismissal. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter AT&T.) (ars)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Theodore Joseph Deschler. (Attachments: #1 email)(mbm)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Helms Motor Company only by Helms Motor Co., Inc.. (Talley, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by Helms Motor Co., Inc. (Talley, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Revised and Final Proposed Scheduling Order by Theodore Joseph Deschler. (Attachments: #1 cover email)(mbm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of proposed Amended Standard Track Scheduling Order by Theodore Joseph Deschler. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order by Theodore Joseph Deschler. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Phillips, J. Britt)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Hickman on behalf of FCA US LLC/RAM (Hickman, Andrew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC/RAM.(Phillips, J. Britt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER:TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, September 29, 2020, 10 A.M. CT before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. Parties shall dial into our telephonic conference service at: (877) 411-9748. The Access Code is 828 9188. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at # http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.docCounsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Helms Motor Co., Inc..(Talley, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC/RAM.(Phillips, J. Britt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Talley on behalf of Helms Motor Co., Inc. (Talley, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore Joseph Deschler as to FCA US LLC/RAM, Helms Motor Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 USPS rcpt./certified card, #2 FCA summons, #3 USPS rcpt./certified card)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #4 envelope) (mbm).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Judge J. Daniel Breen for all further proceedings. Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/18/2020. (mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Judge's card) (mbm).
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC/RAM. The filer is being mailed issued summons. (mbm)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons for FCA US LLC/RAM by Theodore Joseph Deschler. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
August 3, 2020 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Helms Motor Co., Inc. The filer has been mailed issued summons. (mbm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Case initiation fee: $ 400.00, receipt number J4676008655. (mbm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Theodore Joseph Deschler. (Attachments: #1 Summons -Helms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit cover sheet, #4 Ex. A - Repair orders, #5 Ex. B - (2) add. repair docs., #6 Ex. C - Financial docs., #7 Ex. D - 12/2/19 text photo, #8 Ex. E - 1/29/20 email, #9 Ex. F - 2/5/20 Bill Mitchell est., #10 Ex. G - Notice to manufacturer, #11 Ex. H - Docs from manufacturer, #12 Ex. I - Manufacturers response, #13 Ex. J - Complaint - Consumer Affairs, #14 Ex. K - Clint Allen bus. card, #15 Ex. L - Rev. of acceptance ltr, #16 envelope, #17 judge's card)(mbm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deschler v. FCA US LLC/RAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Joseph Deschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helms Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC/RAM
Represented By: Andrew M. Hickman
Represented By: J. Britt Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?