Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC v. Southern Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC
Defendant: Southern Trust Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Pam Carter
Case Number: 1:2020cv01213
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC Service of Initial Disclosures (Songstad, Randall)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC Service of Expert Disclosures (Songstad, Randall)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC. (Songstad, Randall)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Songstad, Randall)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 09:15 AM before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Maurice_Bryson@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (mbb)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Southern Trust Insurance Company of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents upon Plaintiff (Mansfield, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Trust Insurance Company.(Mansfield, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Mansfield, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Trust Insurance Company from Madison County Chancery Court, case number 79345 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3443255), filed by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mansfield, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC v. Southern Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayes Outdoor Media, LLC
Represented By: Randall N Songstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Pam Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?