Harris v. United States of America
Petitioner: Michael Jay Harris
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01215
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/13/2020. (mbm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Release of Attorney Client Privilege proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Wilson, Matthew)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND TO THE 2255 PETITION. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/29/2020. (mbm)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Wilson on behalf of United States of America (Wilson, Matthew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE 2255 MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE against United States of America, filed by Michael Jay Harris. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of, #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2020: #4 judge's card) (mbm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Jay Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew J. Wilson
Represented By: 2255 AUSA - Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?