Ricketts v. West Tennessee Golf, LLC
Plaintiff: James Ricketts
Defendant: West Tennessee Golf, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02008
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Due to attorney scheduling conflicts, Scheduling Conference RESET TO 3/31/2020 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see previous Setting Letter for instructions. Note: text only, no image associated with entry. (ars)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin England on behalf of James Ricketts (England, Erin)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 03/24/2020, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Jenkins, William)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Ricketts as to West Tennessee Golf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Returned Receipt)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to West Tennessee Golf, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
January 6, 2020 NOTICE This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex:1:XX-CV-XXXX or 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleadings to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) Case. The new case number is 1:20-cv-2008. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld) (cdi).
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against West Tennessee Golf, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3251104), filed by James Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricketts v. West Tennessee Golf, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ricketts
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Erin England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Tennessee Golf, LLC
Represented By: William Lewis Jenkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?