United States of America v. Edward Jones et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Christopher Brent Jerrolds
Garnishee: Edward Jones
Case Number: 1:2021cv01011
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF GARNISHMENT OF TRADITIONAL INDIVIDUAL RETIREMENT ACCOUNT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/15/2021. (mbm)
February 23, 2021 NOTICE of receipt of original documents (re #6 Answer to Writ of Garnishment) via UPS by Edward Jones. (cdi)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Edward Jones. ( Rcvd 2/18/21 via e-mail) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(cdi)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America re #4 Writ of Garnishment proof of service upon Debtor's Counsel (Canale, Stuart)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued. (mbm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (PLEASE ISSUE), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Canale, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Edward Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Brent Jerrolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart J. Canale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?