Perry v. Maynard
Plaintiff: Sancho Jermal Perry
Defendant: Mitchell Maynard
Case Number: 1:2021cv01022
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 3/31/2021. (ejc)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH AND DENYING LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 3/31/21. (skc)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 2/22/21. (skc)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA #4 . Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 2/12/21. (skc)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sancho Jermal Perry. (Attachments: #1 acct. info., #2 envelope)(mbm)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1)-(2) OR PAY THE $400 CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 2/1/21. (skc)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Mitchell Maynard, filed by Sancho Jermal Perry. (Attachments: #1 cover note, #2 envelope)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2021: #3 Presider card, #4 Magistrate card) (mbm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sancho Jermal Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?