Cooke v. Miller Transporters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Cooke
Defendant: Robert W. Preusser, Jr., Miller Transportation Services, Inc., Milbank Insurance Company and Miller Transporters, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2021cv01029
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/8/2021. (mbm)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Milbank Insurance Company - proposed order submitted by Milbank Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Howard, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Milbank Insurance Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: 1)Proposed Orders should not be filed in ECF but should be e-mailed to the appropriate Judge's ECF e-mail account in a word processing format. 2)Signatures on documents that are filed in ECF should be in compliance with Local Rule 11.1. 3) The Court's preference is that a motion be filed for such relief instead of just submitting an agreed proposed order. You may file a joint motion for such relief. To correct this deficiency please complete the following: 1) File a motion or a joint motion for the relief you are seeking. 2) Ensure that the signatures on your motion as well as your proposed order is in compliance with Local Rule 11.1. 3) E-mail the proposed order to the appropriate Judge's ECF e-mail account at this time if you have not already done so. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Peter Cooke of Service (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Correct Misnomer of Party Defendant)(Elsea, Shannon)
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Pretrial Order Agreed Order of Dismissal as to Milbank Insurance Company by Milbank Insurance Company. (Howard, Daniel)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Howard on behalf of Milbank Insurance Company (Howard, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Peter Cooke of Service of Initial Disclosures (Elsea, Shannon)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 9:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2022. (ejc)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 6/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2021. Discovery due by 12/13/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/7/2021. Motions due by 12/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 3/10/2021. (ars)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/10/2021. Present were attys Elsea, Wardlaw, and Daniel Howard for unnamed dft Milbank Insurance. Mr. Howard to file Notice of Appearance. Parties agreed on two mediators and will inform Court when they have confirmed a mediation date. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter AT&T.) (ars)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miller Transportation Services, Inc.. (Wardlaw, John)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Miller Transportation Services, Inc. Notice of Service of Defendants Robert W. Preusser, Jr. and Miller Transportation Services' Separate Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions (Wardlaw, John)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER:TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 1:30 PM CT before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. Parties shall dial into our telephonic conference service at: (877) 411-9748. The Access Code is 828 9188. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at # http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.docCounsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Wardlaw, John)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Madison Co. Circuit Court, case number C-20-334-II (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3542160), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wardlaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke v. Miller Transporters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Preusser, Jr.
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Transporters, Inc.
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Cooke
Represented By: Shannon David Elsea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?