Street v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Glenda Street
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01126
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2022. (ars)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2022. ADR deadline is 1/26/2022. Discovery due by 6/6/2022. Motions due by 7/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 11/3/2021. (ars)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2021. Present were attys Williams and Reedy. Trial dates agreed upon. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Teams.) (ars)
October 27, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Parties Mediator Selection by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Reedy, Brandon)
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER:TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET TO Wednesday, November 3, 2021, 9:45 AM CT before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. A phone number will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing date.If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at # http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.docCounsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jon A. York for all further proceedings. Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/27/21. (cdi)
October 26, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reedy, Brandon)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Glenda Street Discovery Responses (Williams, Marianna)
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Glenda Street Service (Williams, Marianna)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re: PLAINTIFF'S #13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Wal-Mart, Inc..(Reedy, Brandon)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Glenda Street, filed by Glenda Street. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Bills) (Williams, Marianna)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/24/2021. (mbm)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Proposed Order Submitted filed by Glenda Street has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Your document was filed using a Motion event but your document is a Memorandum for the Motion filing at DE#9 . Motion events should only be used when your document is actually a motion as it creates pending motions on the Judge's report that are not actually motions. For example this your Motion to Amend Complaint would show as 2 pending motions when it is only one. Your Memorandum should have been filed as an attachment to your motion filing per the Court's ECF Polices and Procedures. If you forgot to attach the memorandum at the time you filed your motion, you should have used one of the following the events: ATTACHMENT (Other Filings>Other Documents>Attachment) or MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (Motions and Related Filings>Responses and Replies> Memorandum in Support of Motion) or NOTICE OF CORRECTION (Other Filings>Notices>Notice of Correction). All 3 of these events should be linked back to the Motion filing. The second motion filing (DE#10 ) has been terminated and the docket text corrected to reflect that the document is a Memorandum and not a Motion. Please ensure that all future filings are in compliance with this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer is not required to file any additional documents at this time. (cdi)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Glenda Street. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Williams, Marianna) Modified on 9/24/2021 to correct docket text (cdi).
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Glenda Street. (Williams, Marianna)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: IN PERSON Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Wal-Mart, Inc. of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Reedy, Brandon)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart, Inc..(Reedy, Brandon)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart, Inc. from Dyer County Circuit Court, case number 21-cv-35 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3696614), filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Summons)(Reedy, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Street v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Street
Represented By: Marianna G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon W. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?