Coln v. Penske Truck Leasing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J Coln
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. doing business as Fedex Ground, Parker Tractor & Implement Co., Inc. and Penske Truck Leasing, Co., LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv01129
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penske Truck Leasing, Co., LP as to Parker Tractor & Implement Co., Inc.. (Lebair, Harry)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Parker Tractor & Implement Co., Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Parker Tractor & Implement Co., Inc. by Penske Truck Leasing, Co., LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Certificate of Insurance, #3 Summons Summons to Parker Tractor)(Lebair, Harry)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/12/2021. (mbm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Party by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. (Lebair, Harry)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/5/2021. (mbm)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. (Lebair, Harry)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry W. Lebair, IV on behalf of Penske Truck Leasing Corporation (Lebair, Harry)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - FedEx, #2 Summons-Parker)(mbm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. J. Spence, Jr on behalf of Thomas J Coln (Spence, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fedex Ground Package System, Inc., Parker Tractor & Implement Co., Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3698240), filed by Thomas J Coln. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Penske, #3 Summons FedEx, #4 Summons Parker, #5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service - Penske, #6 of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service - FedEx, #7 of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service - Parker)(Woo, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coln v. Penske Truck Leasing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Coln
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Represented By: Kristina A. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. doing business as Fedex Ground
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Tractor & Implement Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing, Co., LP
Represented By: Harry W. Lebair, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?