Chambliss et al v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Chambliss and Thomas Chambliss
Defendant: Felipe Martinez, Luebe-Jones, Inc, Avadek, Inc, Avadek, Inc. d/b/a Luebe-Jones, Inc, Perfection Architectural Systems, LLC, Enterprise FM Trust and Avadek, Inc. doing business as Luebe-Jones, Inc
Not Classified By Court: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2021cv01136
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois on 08/19/2021, filed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss. (Vines, Glenn)
November 5, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Felipe Martinez.(Derrick, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 1/23/2023 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 10:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2023. (mbb)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/4/2021. (mbb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie Moffett Cruzen on behalf of Avadek, Inc, Avadek, Inc. d/b/a Luebe-Jones, Inc, Enterprise FM Trust, Luebe-Jones, Inc, Felipe Martinez, Perfection Architectural Systems, LLC (Cruzen, Vickie)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2021 via Telephone. Robert Cobb for the plaintiff. Michael Derrick for the defendants. The Court addressed the dispositive motion deadline with counsel. Counsel agreed with the Court that the dispositive motion deadline should be extended an additional 30 days. The Court directed the parties to re-submit another proposed scheduling order incorporating that change to the Court for approval. Mediator: Floyd Flippin. Counsel advised the Court that they may have to used a different mediator. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (ejc)
October 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss of Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Vines, Glenn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Enterprise FM Trust.(Derrick, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss as to Felipe Martinez. (Vines, Glenn)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 Alias Summons Issued as to Felipe Martinez. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Summons by Glenn K. Vines, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Vines, Glenn)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Deniger Cobb on behalf of Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss (Cobb, Robert)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Enterprise FM Trust on 10/01/2021, filed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss. (Vines, Glenn)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Avadek, Inc. d/b/a Luebe-Jones, Inc, Luebe-Jones, Inc, Perfection Architectural Systems, LLC.(Derrick, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Avadek, Inc. d/b/a Luebe-Jones, Inc, Luebe-Jones, Inc, Perfection Architectural Systems, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Derrick, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: IN PERSON Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 09:15 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Avadek, Inc.(Derrick, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Affidavit of Service served on Felipe Martinez on 9/16/2021, filed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss. (Vines, Glenn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Affidavit of Service served on Perfection Architectural Systems, LLC on 8/30/2021, filed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss. (Vines, Glenn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Affidavit of Service served on AVAdek, Inc. dba Luebe-Jones, Inc. on 8/30/2021, filed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss. (Vines, Glenn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Affidavit of Service served on Luebe-Jones, Inc. on 8/30/2021, filed by Patricia A. Chambliss, Thomas Chambliss. (Vines, Glenn)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avadek, Inc from Madison County Circuit Court, case number C-21-196 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3705607), filed by Avadek, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Derrick, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambliss et al v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Chambliss
Represented By: Glenn K. Vines, Jr
Represented By: Robert Deniger Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chambliss
Represented By: Glenn K. Vines, Jr
Represented By: Robert Deniger Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Martinez
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luebe-Jones, Inc
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avadek, Inc
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avadek, Inc. d/b/a Luebe-Jones, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfection Architectural Systems, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise FM Trust
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avadek, Inc. doing business as Luebe-Jones, Inc
Represented By: Michael G. Derrick
Represented By: Vickie Moffett Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?