Boykin v. Mehr et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Z. Boykin
Defendant: John Mehr, Scott Conger and Madison County Government Officials
Case Number: 1:2021cv01144
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and assessing the $350.00 filing in accordance with the PLRA, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/25/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing transactions by Aaron Z. Boykin. (Attachments: #1 transactions, #2 envelope)(mbm)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Aaron Boykin regarding trust fund account. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (skc)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 u.s.c. 1915(a)(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/04/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Aaron Z. Boykin. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(skc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants filed by Aaron Z. Boykin. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(skc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Mehr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Z. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Government Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?