Garrison v. Balderrama et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison
Defendant: Lisa Balderrama and Madison County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv01147
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Madison County Sheriff's Office advising that Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison is no longer incarcerated in the Madison County Jail. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (agj)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and assessing $350.00 filing fee in accordance with PLRA, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/04/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison. (Attachments: #1 Trust fund balance, #2 Letter, #3 envelope)(skc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 USC 1983 against filed by Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(skc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison v. Balderrama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Ismail Muhammad Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?