Hines v. Tennessee Dept of Corrections
Plaintiff: Channing Hines
Defendant: Tennessee Dept of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2022cv01286
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Channing Hines regarding inability to obtain trust fund statement. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (gkp)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 01/05/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (gkp)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel by Channing Hines. (gkp)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Channing Hines. (gkp)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 Letter from Channing Hines regarding forwarding address once released from Madison Co Jail. (gkp)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 USC 1983 against Tennessee Dept of Corrections, filed by Channing Hines. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(gkp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2022: #2 Judicial assignment cards) (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Tennessee Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channing Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?