Quince v. Goodman
Plaintiff: Brandon Quince
Defendant: Luke Goodman
Case Number: 1:2023cv01002
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable DE #4 . "Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward" Mail sent to Brandon Quince. (gkp)
January 24, 2023 Filing 5 Mail (Docket Sheet) Returned as Undeliverable. "Not Deliverable, unable to forward" Mail sent to Brandon Quince. (gkp) Modified on 1/24/2023 to add that docket sheet was returned (gkp).
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 01/10/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (gkp)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Brandon Quince. Filed with Cover Letter Stating he is Unable to Receive Copy of Trust Fund Account and Requesting Appointment of Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(gkp) Modified on 1/6/2023 to correct spacing. (gkp)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 USC 1983, filed by Brandon Quince. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 Supplement Statement of Claim Continuation)(gkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quince v. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Quince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?