Morris v. Obion Co. Jail
Plaintiff: Christopher Lynn Morris
Defendant: Obion Co. Jail
Case Number: 1:2023cv01181
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee in accordance with the PLRA, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/10/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Lynn Morris. (Attachments: #1 trust fund statement, #2 envelope)(jae)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(A)(1)-(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/31/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Obion Co. Jail, filed by Christopher Lynn Morris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Case assignment label)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Obion Co. Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lynn Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obion Co. Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?