McQuiston v. United States of America
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: Dale Conrad McQuiston
Case Number: 1:2024cv01162
Filed: August 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing from the US Court of Appeals as to the Petition and District Court's Order. (Attachments: #1 District Court Order)(skc)
August 14, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by the US Court of Appeals Ruling Letter sent to Mr. McQuiston to file a corrected second successive habeas motion. (US Court of Appeals No.: 24-5736) (skc)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION/MOTION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS AS A SECOND OR SUCCESSIVE PETITION. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/12/24. (skc)
August 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Faith Parish on behalf of United States of America (Parish, Caroline)
August 9, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (gkp)
August 9, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION UNDER 28 USC 2255 TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY against United States of America, filed by Dale Conrad McQuiston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Action, #2 Exhibit B, Voided Notice of Action, #3 Exhibit C, Sentence Computation, #4 Envelope)(gkp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2024: #5 Judicial Label) (gkp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQuiston v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Caroline Faith Parish
Represented By: 2255 AUSA - Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Conrad McQuiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?