Harrison v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Daejuan Harrison
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2024cv01268
Filed: December 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2025 Filing 8 SSA CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in answer to Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Murphy, Kevin)
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 1/8/2025. (Claxton, Charmiane)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 USC 405(g), effective December 1, 2022, Defendant has 60 days to file an answer, which may be limited to a certified copy of the administrative record, and to any affirmative defenses under Civil Rule 8(c). Plaintiff must file and serve on the Commissioner a brief for the requested relief within 30 days after the answer is filed or 30 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion filed under Rule 4(c), whichever is later. The Commissioner must file a brief and serve it on Plaintiff within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief and serve it on the Commissioner within 14 days after service of the Commissioner's brief. The Parties' briefs must support assertions of fact by citations to particular parts of the record. Federal Rule 6(b)(1) remains available to the parties. To the extent not superseded by the Supplemental Rules, the Local Rules of the Court remain in effect for Social Security Appeals.. Signed by Clerk of Court on 12/27/2024. (gkp)
December 27, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING TO SSA: Compliance with Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 USC 405(g), effective December 1, 2022, has been met by transmittal of a Notice of Electronic Filing to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney. As a result of the notice to the Office of General Counsel (SSA Commissioner), Plaintiff is NOT required to serve the summons and complaint. (gkp)
December 27, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (gkp)
December 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (gkp)
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Daejuan Harrison. (gkp)
December 27, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Review of a Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision against Social Security Administration, filed by Daejuan Harrison. (Attachments: #1 SSA Denial Notice, #2 Judicial Label)(gkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Kevin Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daejuan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?