Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc. v. National Capital Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: National Capital Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv02104
Filed: February 20, 2009
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/15/11. (Anderson, S.)
October 18, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/18/11. (Anderson, S.)
March 19, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/19/2010. (Anderson, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc. v. National Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Curry-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?