Harkness v. United Sates of America
Plaintiff: Furniss Harkness
Defendant: United Sates of America
Case Number: 2:2010cv02868
Filed: December 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Furniss Harkness. (lgw)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 5/8/12. (lgw)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Setting Telephone Status Conference and Directing Counsel to submit case summary, ( Telephone Status Conference set for 4/23/2012 10:00 AM before Robert H. Cleland.) THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 4/17/2012. (lgw)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/6/11. (Anderson, S.)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/30/11. (Anderson, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harkness v. United Sates of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Furniss Harkness
Represented By: Arthur A Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sates of America
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?