Moses v. YouTube, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pamela Moses
Defendant: YouTube Inc., YouTube LLC, Google Inc. and Shira Krasnow
Case Number: 2:2012cv02822
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2013 Filing 92 Pro Se MOTION For A Hearing On Defendant's Motion For Sanctions by Pamela Moses. (jld)
May 2, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE by Shira Krasnow re 90 Reply to Response to Motion (Reviere, Russell)
April 30, 2013 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 Response to Motion filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell) Modified on 5/6/2013 (jml) document termed per #91.
April 30, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE by Shira Krasnow re 87 Notice (Other) Krasnow's Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Pleadings (ECF. 87) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit correspondence)(Reviere, Russell)
April 29, 2013 Filing 88 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants Krasnow Motion re 85 for Sanctions Against Plaintiff filed by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(csf)
April 26, 2013 Filing 87 Plaintiff's Pleadings action's Before the Magistrate by Pamela Moses (csf)
April 23, 2013 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion for Recusal re 84 filed by Pamela Moses. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2013: # 1 Proposed Order) (jld).
April 22, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION for Sanctions by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Reviere, Russell)
April 22, 2013 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION for Recusal filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
April 22, 2013 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re 79 MOTION for Recusal Response of Defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc. Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal by Magistrate Judge (Doc. 79) (proposed Order submitted) filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Moses 4-4-13 Email, # 2 Risin Bio)(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 75 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 4/10/2013. (Vescovo, Diane)
April 8, 2013 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
April 8, 2013 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Reconsideration Response of Defendants YouTube Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google Inc. Opposing Plaintiff's Second Motion to Reconsider Rule 16(b) Schedulnig Order (ECF No. 75) (proposed order submitted) filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
April 4, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION for Magistrate to Recues Herself-For Interest 28 U.S.C.A. § 4551 by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Certificate of Consultation, # 3 Affidavit in Support)(csf)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay Discovery; granting 56 Motion for Joinder in Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery is stayed pending the court rules on the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 4/2/2013. (Vescovo, Diane)
March 27, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or Bifurcate and Stay Claims under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b), 30 MOTION for Protective Order , 55 MOTION to Stay YouTube Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Motions to Dismiss (Including Certificate of Consultation) (proposed order submitted), 65 MOTION to Dismiss proposed rrder submitted, 35 MOTION To Leave Sought for Plaintiff''s Ammendment Of Complaint To Add Cause Of Action Against Amazon.Com As Third Party Defendant Pursuant To Federal Civ.P.14(B),15(A), 60 MOTION For A Evidentiary Hearing On Specific Personal Jurisdiction Over Defendant Krasnow, 48 MOTION To Add Addistional Interrogotories for defendant Shira Krasnow's And Attorney Russell Reviere To Establish Personal Jurisdiction., 22 MOTION to Add Additional Interrogotories for Defendant Shira Krasnow's and Attorney Russell Reviere to Establish Personal Jurisdiction, 75 MOTION for Reconsideration per #76-77., 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 19 MOTION To Deny Defendant Krasnow Rule 12(b)(2) Motion To Motion To Dismiss, 47 MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 32 Response to Motion , 56 MOTION for Joinder proposed order submitted per #77. (jml)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 03/25/2013. (McCalla, Jon)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 75 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Pamela Moses. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/21/13. (McCalla, Jon)
March 21, 2013 Filing 75 Pro SE MOTION for Reconsideration On Ruling Of Schedule Hearing And Amending Of Scheduling Order by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(jld)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 69 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 3/19/2013. (Vescovo, Diane)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 69 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Pamela Moses. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/18/13. (McCalla, Jon)
March 15, 2013 Filing 72 Reply to Defendants Motion to Add Additional Interrogatories by Pamela Moses (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Plaintiff-Alleged trademark, copyright, dilution, tarnishment violation)(csf)
March 14, 2013 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Pamela Moses. (jld)
March 14, 2013 Filing 70 REPLY to Response re 68 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Pamela Moses. (jld)
March 12, 2013 Filing 69 Pro Se MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and or Revisions by Pamela Moses. (jld)
March 11, 2013 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, YouTube Defendants' Reply in Support of YouTube Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or Bifurcate and Stay Claims Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b) filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 3/8/2013. (Vescovo, Diane)
February 28, 2013 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2013. Pro Se Plaintiff present. Counsel for the defendants present. Proposed Scheduling Order submitted by the defendants. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order based on lenght of time from a ruling on pending Motions to Dismiss. The Court discussed consultation via email, time to respond, ADR/Mediation, Magistrate Judge consent, local rules, etc with the parties. Counsel for the defendants to draft Scheduling Order, circulate to Pro Se Plaintiff and submit to the Court within one week for final approval and entry. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Mark Vorder-Bruegge and John Mancini (via telephone) for YouTube & Google, Christopher Frulla for Krasnow.) (Tape #FTR) (cas)
February 28, 2013 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss proposed order submitted by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Reviere, Russell)
February 21, 2013 Filing 64 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order)(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
February 21, 2013 Filing 63 Plaintiff's Response & Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Google's & YouTube's Motion to Dismiss re 37 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or Bifurcate and Stay Claims under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b) filed by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A Certificate of Registration)(csf)
February 20, 2013 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION For A Evidentiary Hearing On Specific Personal Jurisdiction Over Defendant Krasnow proposed order submitted filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
February 20, 2013 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
February 19, 2013 Filing 60 Pro Se MOTION For A Evidentiary Hearing On Specific Personal Jurisdiction Over Defendant Krasnow by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(jld)
February 18, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION for Joinder proposed order submitted by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Reviere, Russell)
February 15, 2013 Filing 59 Plaintiff's Response (REPLY) to Defendant's Krasnow Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Time Extension re 54 filed by Pamela Moses. (csf)
February 15, 2013 Filing 58 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendant's Google's & YouTube's Proposed Order on Motion re 55 to Stay Discovery of All Claims & Bifucurating Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by Pamela Moses. (csf)
February 15, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time Complete Responses to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss by Pamela Moses. (csf)
February 14, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION to Stay YouTube Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Motions to Dismiss (Including Certificate of Consultation) (proposed order submitted) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
February 13, 2013 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
February 11, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Pro Se Plaintiff's Reply To Defendant's Response In Oppoisition To Defendant's Rule 12(b)(2) Motion To Dismiss by Pamela Moses. (jld)
February 5, 2013 Filing 52 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Response to Defendants Motion To Dismiss by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(jld)
February 5, 2013 Filing 51 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order to ECF_Judge_Vescovo@tnwd.uscourts.gov by Thursday, 2/21/2013. Reminder: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least seven days before the scheduling conference. If the proposed order is approved and filed and the 26(f) report has been docketed, the conference will be canceled. NOTE: Revised Scheduling Order (Rev. 3/12) form and scheduling conference instructions on Judge Vescovo's page at www.tnwd.uscourts.gov.(crk)
February 4, 2013 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION To Add Addistional Interrogotories for defendant Shira Krasnow's And Attorney Russell Reviere To Establish Personal Jurisdiction. filed by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
January 31, 2013 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint & Add Supplemental to Original Complaint) against All Defendants., filed by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Pretty Pimp, # 2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Plaintiff of Witness Rachel Marmon, # 3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Plaintiff of Witness Mario Walker)(ac)
January 31, 2013 Filing 48 Pro Se Plaintiff's Second MOTION To Add Additional Interrogatories for defendant Shira Krasnow's And Attorney Russell Reviere To Establish Personal Jurisdiction, by Pamela Moses. (jld)
January 31, 2013 Filing 47 MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 32 Response to Motion by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 31 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 01/31/2013. (McCalla, Jon)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 01/31/2013. (McCalla, Jon)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Explanation of Reasoning for Transfer and Assignment of Case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/28/13. (McCalla, Jon)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/28/13. (McCalla, Jon)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 21 Motion of Opposition of Notice of Appearance. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/28/13. (McCalla, Jon)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Defendants To Show Just Cause. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/28/13. (McCalla, Jon)
January 25, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION for Explanation Reasoning of Transfer and Assignment of Case Hearing Requested by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Consultation on Motion for Explanation Reasoning of Transfer and Assignment of Case Hearing Requested)(csf)
January 25, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION for Temporary Injunction on Google Websites WWW.Google.Com & WWW.YouTube.Com Pending Final Resolution of Above Complaint by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Affidavit, # 2 Certification of Consultation on Motion for Injunction and Hearing)(csf)
January 25, 2013 Filing 38 ATTACHMENT: Certification of Consultation on Motion 35 to Leave Amended Complaint and Add Supplement by Pamela Moses. (csf)
January 23, 2013 Filing 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or Bifurcate and Stay Claims under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 YouTube Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or Bifurcate and Stay Claims Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b))(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
January 17, 2013 Filing 36 Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham no longer assigned to case - per 33 . (smm)
January 17, 2013 Filing 35 Pro Se MOTION To Leave Sought for Plaintiff''s Amendment Of Complaint To Add Cause Of Action Against Amazon.Com As Third Party Defendant Pursuant To Federal Civ.P.14(B),15(A) by Pamela Moses. (jld)
January 17, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - This is to notify the parties that the scheduling conference set for 1/31/13 in this case has been canceled. The parties will be notified by Judge Vescovo of the new scheduling conference date. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED). (Pham, Tu)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF TRANSFER - This case is hereby transferred to United States Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo as referral judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 1/17/13. (Pham, Tu)
January 17, 2013 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Reviere, Russell)
January 16, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena and Protective Order in Regards to Production of Documents by Pamela Moses. (csf)
January 10, 2013 Filing 30 MOTION for Protective Order by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Reviere, Russell)
January 10, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by William Christopher Frulla on behalf of Shira Krasnow (Frulla, William)
January 10, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct Response of Defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube LLC, and Google Inc. to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (proposed order submitted) filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
January 9, 2013 Filing 27 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint & Add Supplement to Original Complaint by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Pretty Pimp, # 2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Plaintiff Witness Rachel Marmon, # 3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Plaintiff Witness Mario Walker)(csf)
January 7, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SETTING - A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET on THURSDAY, January 31, 2013 at 9:45 A.M. in Courtroom 6, on the 3rd floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee, before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (bdg)
December 27, 2012 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION of Opposition of Notice of Appearance re 17 Notice of Appearance Response of YouTube and Google Defendants Opposing Plaintiff's "Motion of Opposition of Notice of Appearance" (Doc. 21) (proposed order submitted) filed by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Letter, # 2 Attachment 2 - Admission Application, # 3 Attachment 3 - Admission Notification)(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
December 18, 2012 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Reviere, Russell)
December 18, 2012 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Add Additional Interrogotories for Defendant Shira Krasnow's and Attorney Russell Reviere to Establish Personal Jurisdiction filed by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Reviere, Russell)
December 14, 2012 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION to Add Additional Interrogotories for Defendant Shira Krasnow's and Attorney Russell Reviere to Establish Personal Jurisdiction by Pamela Moses. (csf)
December 13, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION of Opposition of Notice of Appearance re 17 by Pamela Moses. (csf)
December 7, 2012 Filing 20 Pro Se Plaintiff's RESPONSE To Shira Krasnow's Memorandum Of Law in Opposition Of The Rule 12(b)(2) re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (jld)
December 7, 2012 Filing 19 Pro Se MOTION To Deny Defendant Krasnow Rule 12(b)(2) Motion To Motion To Dismiss by Pamela Moses. (jld)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 1/10/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/4/12. (McCalla, Jon)
December 4, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by A John Peter Mancini on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc. (Mancini, A John)
November 29, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shira Krasnow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Reviere, Russell)
November 26, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to YouTube, Inc.. (jld)
November 26, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Shira Krasnow. (Reviere, Russell)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/10/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/26/12. (McCalla, Jon)
November 21, 2012 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION for Defendants to Show Just Cause On Motion To Enlarge Time, by Pamela Moses. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(jld)
November 20, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion (Including Memorandum) to Enlarge Time (With Certificate of Consultation) (proposed order submitted) by Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
November 20, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube LLC, YouTube, Inc. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
November 16, 2012 Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added per email from chambers ( Judge Pham is the patent referral judge). Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo no longer assigned to case. (jae)
November 16, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Reviere on behalf of Shira Krasnow (Reviere, Russell)
November 15, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Shira Krasnow. (jld)
November 15, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to YouTube Legal Corporate. (jld)
November 15, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Google Inc.. (jld)
October 23, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to YouTube LLC. Issued summons delivered to marshal for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons issued as to Google Inc., # 2 Summons issued to Shira Krasnow)(csf)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER To Issue and Effect Service of Process and ORDER To Notify Register of Copyrights. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/15/12. (McCalla, Jon)
September 25, 2012 CLERK'S REFERRAL TO STAFF ATTORNEY. Clerk's review of preliminary matters completed. (csf)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/24/12. (McCalla, Jon)
September 21, 2012 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Moses. (csf)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 101 filed by Pamela Moses against All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - D, # 2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. YouTube, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shira Krasnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?