Church Joint Venture, a limited partnership v. Blasingame et al
Plaintiff: Church Joint Venture, a limited partnership
Defendant: Earl Benard Blasingame, Margaret Gooch Blasingame, Katherine Blasingame Church, Earl Benard "Be Blasingame, Jr., Blasingame Family Business Investment Trust, Blasingame Family Residence Generation Skip Children Trust, The Blasingame Trust, Flozone Services Inc, Fiberzone Technologies Inc and G F Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv02999
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 226 Defendants' Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 08/08/2017. (Mays, Samuel)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying 191 Motion to Strike and addressing 198 , 199 , 200 , and 201 parties' memoranda and responses regarding issues remaining for trial. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 03/09/2017. (Mays, Samuel)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 160 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 160 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 174 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 11/17/16. (Mays, Samuel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Joint Venture, a limited partnership v. Blasingame et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Joint Venture, a limited partnership
Represented By: Bruce W. Akerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Benard Blasingame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gooch Blasingame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Blasingame Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Benard "Be Blasingame, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blasingame Family Business Investment Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blasingame Family Residence Generation Skip Children Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blasingame Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flozone Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiberzone Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G F Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?