WCM Industries, Inc. v. IPS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: WCM Industries, Inc.
Defendant: IPS Corporation, American Brass & Aluminum Foundry Company and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2013cv02019
Filed: January 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Presiding Judge: Tu M. Pham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER CONCERNING ATTORNEYS FEES, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUNSET PERIOD ROYALTIES. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/29/2016. (McCalla, Jon)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER granting 487 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 602 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 619 Motion to Stay; denying 704 Motion. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 8/26/2016. (McCalla, Jon)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting 488 Motion ; denying 525 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 5/12/2016. (McCalla, Jon)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER denying 521 Sealed Motion; denying 522 Sealed Motion; denying 524 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 5/11/2016. (McCalla, Jon)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER denying 227 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 234 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 235 Sealed Motion; denying 236 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 237 Sealed Motion; denying 238 Motion for Partial Su mmary Judgment; denying 239 Sealed Motion; denying 241 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 257 Sealed Motion; denying 261 Motion in Limine; denying 262 Sealed Motion; granting 263 Motion in Limine; granting 264 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/5/2015. (McCalla, Jon)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/2/2013. (McCalla, Jon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WCM Industries, Inc. v. IPS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WCM Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Todd P. Blakely
Represented By: Matthew F. Jones
Represented By: David B. Kellis
Represented By: Glen G. Reid, Jr.
Represented By: Ian R. Walsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brass & Aluminum Foundry Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?