United States of America v. Edmond et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Stephanie Edmond and Tax Factory Enterprise, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02938
Filed: December 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Presiding Judge: Tu M. Pham
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE ORDERS OF CONTEMPT 97 , GRANTING CROSS-MOTION TO REIMPOSE CONTEMPT SANCTIONS 98 , AND GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL TURNING OVER OF FUNDS 74 . Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/12/2016. (Anderson, S.)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ON THIRD MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/21/2016. (Anderson, S.)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/4/2016. (Anderson, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Edmond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher W. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Edmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Factory Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?