Williams v. Shelby County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Sonya P Williams
Defendant: Shelby County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2017cv02050
Filed: January 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Presiding Judge: Samuel H. Mays
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Granting in Part 247 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and Calculating Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 2/23/2021. (ljt) (Main Document 254 replaced on 2/23/2021) (ljt).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER on Plaintiff's Damages for Her Teacher Tenure Act Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/2/2020. (ljt)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S TEACHER TENURE ACT CLAIM. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 08/13/2020. (kah)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying 215 Plaintiff's Motion for Revision of an Interlocutory Order on her Title VII Failure to Rehire Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 07/07/2020. (kah)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Granting 185 Defendant's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying As Moot 186 Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 04/10/2020. (kah)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion to Certify Questions to the Supreme Court of Tennessee. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/13/2019. (kah)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER SUSTAINING CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 2/8/2019. (pab)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Sustaining 97 Claim of Privilege--Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/16/2019. (pab)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/18/2018. (pab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Shelby County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya P Williams
Represented By: Teresa A. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?