Lee v. Horton et al

Plaintiff: Christie Lee
Defendant: Rodney Horton and The Kroger Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02766
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M. Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 40 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/4/18. (Sullivan, Daniel)
September 25, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 61 Report and Recommendations and denying 34 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/25/18. (Sullivan, Daniel)
April 23, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 4/23/2018. (Pham, Tu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Lee
Represented By: Olufemi G. Salu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?