Guest House at Graceland, LLC v. Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Guest House at Graceland, LLC
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02495
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Fortin on behalf of Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Fortin, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER Withdrawing #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 08/31/2018. (jjf)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Friday, 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/30/2018. William R. Bradley appeared for the Plaintiff. Michael L. Foran appeared for the Defendant. #8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with regard to Count III of the Complaint is withdrawn by permission. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Friday, 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Foran on behalf of Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Foran, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan. (Myatt, Christopher)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2853620) filed by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2853626) filed by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the wrong form and the wrong process was used to file this motion. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2853626) by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Myatt, Christopher)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2853620) by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Myatt, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Myatt, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Count III of Complaint) by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Myatt, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for Thursday, 8/30/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291.(jpw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday 8/29/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291.(jrs)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-002814-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2837992), filed by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Myatt, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guest House at Graceland, LLC v. Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Represented By: Matthew Fortin
Represented By: Michael L Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guest House at Graceland, LLC
Represented By: William R. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?