Tennco Holdings, LLC et al v. King et al
Plaintiff: Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. and Tennco Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Dennis King and Phil Sandhaus
Undetermined: Clerk and Master Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02499
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Insufficient Service of Process filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wade, Allan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Tennco Holdings, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits)(Wade, Allan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Dennis King. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons by Brandy S. Parrish on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Parrish, Brandy)
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons by Brandy S. Parrish on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Parrish, Brandy)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel D. Lipshie on behalf of All Defendants (Lipshie, Samuel)
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Insufficient Service of Process filed by All Defendants. (Allen, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Insufficient Service of Process by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dennis V. King, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Philip Sandhaus)(Allen, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Phil Sandhaus, Dennis King has been filed. Please note there is a wet signature on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policiies and Procedures 10.1.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1010-2 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2838573), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Process, Pleadings, and Orders)(Allen, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennco Holdings, LLC et al v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.
Represented By: Allan J. Wade
Represented By: Brandy S. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennco Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Allan J. Wade
Represented By: Brandy S. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clerk and Master Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis King
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Allen
Represented By: Samuel D. Lipshie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Sandhaus
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Allen
Represented By: Samuel D. Lipshie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?