Shelby County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Shelby County
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., McKesson Corporation, NORAMCO, INC., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., MALLINCKRODT LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Endo Health Solutions Inc., MALLINCKRODT PLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc. and Cephalon, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02528
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to NORAMCO, INC.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to MALLINCKRODT LLC. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Johnson & Johnson. (Stranch, J.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 16, 2018 Filing 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-49) MDL No. 2804. Signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel on 8/16/2018. (agj)
August 15, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Purdue Pharma, L.P.. (Stranch, J.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelby County as to Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Stranch, J.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Stranch, III on behalf of Shelby County (Stranch, James)
August 6, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Orlandi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orlandi, Anthony)
August 2, 2018 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to NORAMCO, INC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Endo Health Solutions Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to MALLINCKRODT LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, L.P.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Shelby County. Amendment to 8 Deficiency Notice,, . (Attachments: #1 Summons Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Summons Purdue Pharma, Inc., #3 Summons Purdue Frederick Company Inc, #4 Summons Mallinckrodt LLC, #5 Summons Endo Health Solutions Inc, #6 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #7 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #8 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #9 Summons Cephalon, Inc., #10 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #11 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, #13 Summons Noramco Inc, #14 Summons AmerisourceBergen, #15 Summons Cardinal Health, #16 Summons McKesson)(Stranch, J.)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Marshall Jones on behalf of Shelby County (Jones, John)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Shelby County has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Summons need to be filed as individual documents. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia Ruth Herzfeld on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Herzfeld, Tricia)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Andrew Gastel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gastel, Benjamin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2847064), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cvr Sheet, #2 Summons All Defendants)(Stranch, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelby County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby County
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Represented By: Tricia Ruth Herzfeld
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: James G. Stranch, III
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: John Marshall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?