National Association for the Advancement of Colored People v. Shelby County Election Commission
Plaintiff: Dr. Noel Hutchison, Tamara Hendrix, Janice F. Scott, National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Memphis Branch (NAACP), Angela Barksdale and National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Memphis Branch (NAACP)
Defendant: Anthony Tate, Dee Nollner, Robert Meyers, Shelby County Election Commission, Linda Phillips, Steve Stamson and Norma Lester
Undetermined: Donna L. Russell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02534
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: The following deadlines/schedules have been established: initial disclosures ddl 11/09/18; joining parties ddl 12/14/18; amended pleadings ddl 11/02/18; motions to dismiss ddl 12/24/18; expert disclosures due 12/31/18 for pltfs, 01/30/19 for defts; expert witness depos ddl 02/15/19; supplementation ddl 05/17/19; written discovery ddl 11/30/18; depositions ddl 02/15/19; all discovery ddl 02/15/19; mediation ddl 03/01/19; motions to exclude experts/daubert motions ddl 05/20/19; dispositive motions ddl 03/15/19; Non-Jury Trial set Monday, 06/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (2 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 05/31/2019 at 10:00 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 05/24/2019. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 09/25/2018. (Mays, Samuel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, 06/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 05/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 05/24/2019. (zsf)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTES: Scheduling Conference held on 09/25/2018 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Alexander Wharton appeared for pltfs; Attys John Ryder & Pablo Varela appeared for defts; proposed scheduling order was adopted. The following ddls/scheds were established: initial disclosures ddl 11/09/18; joining parties ddl 12/14/18; amended pleadings ddl 11/02/18; motions to dismiss ddl 12/24/18; expert disclosures due 12/31/18 for pltfs, 01/30/19 for defts; expert witness depos ddl 02/15/19; supplementation ddl 05/17/19; written discovery ddl 11/30/18; depositions ddl 02/15/19; all discovery ddl 02/15/19; mediation ddl 03/01/19; motions to exclude experts/daubert motions ddl 05/20/19; dispositive motions ddl 03/15/19; Non-Jury Trial set Monday, 06/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (2 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 05/31/2019 at 10:00 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 05/24/2019. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (zsf)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Varela, Pablo)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on September 20, 2018.
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Varela, Pablo)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is RESET to Tuesday, 09/25/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (RESET from 09/24/18) (jl)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Wharton, Alexander)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Varela, Pablo)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Monday, 09/24/2018 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelby County Election Commission from Chancery Court of Tennessee Thirtieth Judicial District at Memphis, case number CH-18-1003 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2847991), filed by Shelby County Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Varela, Pablo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People v. Shelby County Election Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Tate
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Nollner
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Meyers
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Election Commission
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Phillips
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Stamson
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Lester
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Noel Hutchison
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hendrix
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice F. Scott
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Memphis Branch (NAACP)
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Barksdale
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Memphis Branch (NAACP)
Represented By: Alexander C. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Donna L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?