Reed v. Regional One Health Loop Center et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Reed
Defendant: Trevina H. Springer, Garnett Miller, Anita Ellis, Patrick Malone, Sandy D. Wilson, Regional One Health Loop Center and Robert Brown
Case Number: 2:2018cv02606
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Regional One Health Loop Center. (Coston-Holloway, Joann)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Patrick Malone, Garnett Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Garnett Miller, NP, #2 Affidavit of Patrick Malone, MD)(Francis, Raleigh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raymond Reed.(vup)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regional One Health Loop Center. (Coston-Holloway, Joann)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Regional One Health Loop Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Imad Abdullah)(Coston-Holloway, Joann)
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joann K. Coston-Holloway on behalf of Regional One Health Loop Center (Coston-Holloway, Joann)
October 1, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Raleigh Kent Francis on behalf of Patrick Malone, Garnett Miller (Francis, Raleigh)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Patrick Malone, Garnett Miller. (Vescovo, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Vescovo on behalf of Patrick Malone, Garnett Miller (Vescovo, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Regional One Health Loop Center. (vup) (vup).
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Anita Ellis. (vup)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Garnett Miller. (vup)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Patrick Malone. (vup)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Trevina H. Springer.(vup)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sandy D. Wilson. (vup)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert Brown. (vup)
September 4, 2018 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE: Declined agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Raymond Reed (csf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676039290 (csf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Raymond Reed against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Judicial Cards)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2018: #2 Medical Records) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Regional One Health Loop Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevina H. Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnett Miller
Represented By: Christopher L. Vescovo
Represented By: Raleigh Kent Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Malone
Represented By: Christopher L. Vescovo
Represented By: Raleigh Kent Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional One Health Loop Center
Represented By: Joann K. Coston-Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?