Elmore et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: David Elmore and Emily Elmore
Defendant: United States of America and Tia Harris
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02608
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION Of Mediator by David Elmore. (Porter, Matthew)
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Canale, Stuart)
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by David Elmore (Porter, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 27 SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, 10/21/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 10/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2019. (tlh)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Status / Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2018. Matthew Porter appearing for the Plaintiff. Stuart Canale appearing for the Defendant. Judgment was entered on 10/3/2018. Parties requested status conference, parties only meant for case to be dismissed as to Emily Elmore. Case reopened & scheduling conference held. Deadlines/Dates established: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, 10/21/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 2 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 10/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/4/2019. Parties do not consent to trial by Magistrate Judge. Judgment to be amended. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo)(9:00-9:21) (tlh)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/5/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED JUDGMENT (AMENDING #20 ). Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/5/18. (shl)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE THE UNITED STATES AS DEFENDANT AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION #19 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/5/18. (shl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 SETTING LETTER: Status / Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 10/5/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION [Text Only - No Image Attached]: (re #18 Setting Letter) Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2018 is CANCELLED. (tlh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/3/18. (shl)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE THE UNITED STATES AS DEFENDANT #6 AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION #7 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/3/18. (shl)
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET for Friday, 10/5/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 Summons REISSUED as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney)(jae)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Summons by Matthew V. Porter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Matthew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Summons by Matthew V. Porter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Matthew)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting proposed Scheduling Order submitted. (Canale, Stuart)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Summons by Matthew V. Porter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons by Matthew V. Porter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 10/4/2018 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney)(jae)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons by Matthew V. Porter on behalf of David Elmore. (Porter, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons by Matthew V. Porter on behalf of David Elmore. (Porter, Matthew)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Canale, Stuart)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Party proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Canale, Stuart)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Chancery Court of TN Thirtieth Judicial District, case number CT-003834-18, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Canale, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmore et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart J. Canale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tia Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elmore
Represented By: Matthew V. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Elmore
Represented By: Matthew V. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?