Kibodeaux v. Gillespie et al
Plaintiff: Ovide Kibodeaux
Defendant: Antonio Gillespie, Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Patriot Logistics Group, LLC
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02613
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Selected Mediator by Antonio Gillespie, Patriot Logistics Group, LLC. (Vescovo, Stephen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 11/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2019. (tlh)
October 8, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Baxter Healthcare Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Atkins, Jay)
October 8, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Antonio Gillespie, Patriot Logistics Group, LLC of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Park, Alexander)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Ovide Kibodeaux Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure (Brendel, Ian)
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 10/4/2018. Ian Brendel appearing by phone for the Plaintiff. Stephen Vescovo, Alexander Park & Jay Atkins (by phone) appearing for Defendants. Deadlines/Dates established: Jury Trial set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 11/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2019. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo)(11:00-11:33) (tlh)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/4/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Antonio Gillespie, Patriot Logistics Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vescovo, Stephen)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Baxter Healthcare Corporation re #12 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Business Entity Detail)(Atkins, Jay)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Antonio Gillespie, Patriot Logistics Group, LLC. (Park, Alexander)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Proposed Order Submitted. (Park, Alexander)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander H. Park on behalf of Antonio Gillespie, Patriot Logistics Group, LLC (Park, Alexander)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Baxter Healthcare Corporation of Joinder and Consent to Removal (Atkins, Jay)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Ovide Kibodeaux. (Brendel, Ian)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Ovide Kibodeaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - August 14, 2018 email correspondence, #2 Exhibit "B" - Baxter Healthcare Corporation Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit "B1" - Plaintiff response and memorandum in opposition to Baxter Healthcare Corporations Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit "C" - Plaintiffs State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit "D" - Copy of Issued Summonses in State Court to Defendants Gillespie and Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, #6 Exhibit "E" - Copy of filed Return of Non-Service for Defendant Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, #7 Exhibit "F" - Copy of filed Reissue of Summons to Defendant Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, #8 Exhibit "G" - Copy of filed Return of Non-Service for Defendant Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, #9 Exhibit "H" - Copy of filed Alias Summons to Defendant Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, #10 Exhibit "I" - Copy of Email correspondence between counsel for Plaintiff and Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, #11 Exhibit "J" - Copy of Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit "K" - Filed Copy of Return of Non-Service for Defendant Gillespie by Private Process Server, #13 Exhibit "L" - Filed Copy of Alias Summons Issued to Defendant Gillespie on June 20, 2018, #14 Exhibit "M" - Filed Copy of Return of Service for Defendant Baxter Healthcare Corporation, #15 Exhibit "N" - Email correspondence from Plaintiffs Counsel to Process Server to Stop Service Attempts on Defendant Gillespie., #16 Exhibit "O" - Email correspondence from opposing counsel opposing Motion to Remand.)(Brendel, Ian)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 10/4/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, Antonio Gillespie from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-004993-17 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2871277), filed by Patriot Logistics Group, LLC, Antonio Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Vescovo, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kibodeaux v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Gillespie
Represented By: Stephen W. Vescovo
Represented By: Alexander H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Logistics Group, LLC
Represented By: Stephen W. Vescovo
Represented By: Alexander H. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovide Kibodeaux
Represented By: Ian A Brendel
Represented By: Ian A. Brendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?