Berry v. Citi Credit Bureau et al
Plaintiff: Chandra L Berry
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC and Citi Credit Bureau
Undetermined: Clerk Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02654
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION Selecting ADR Mediator by Trans Union, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/9/2018. (Vescovo, Diane)
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo: Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2018. Pro Se Plaintiff present. Counsel for the defendant present via telephone. Proposed Scheduling Order submitted. The Court verified the Plaintiffs contact information. The Court discussed the deadlines/date with the parties. The Court discussed case consolidation with the parties. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Katherine Robinson.) (Tape #FTR) (cas)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON #16 TRANS UNION, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/5/2018. (Vescovo, Diane)
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference (proposed Order submitted) by Trans Union, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting , Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Setting. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/24/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION [Text Only - No Image Attached]: (re #10 Setting Letter) Scheduling Conference set before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/7/2018 is CANCELLED. (tlh)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) Modified on 10/23/2018 (Lipman, Sheryl).
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 11/7/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/10/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2898880) by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (1), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (2))(Carlton Robinson, Katherine)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Trans Union, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Anthony, David)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC.. (Anthony, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from Shelby County General Session, case number 1943346 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2886783), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons filed in the General Session Court, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed in the General Session Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anthony, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Citi Credit Bureau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: David M. Anthony
Represented By: Katherine E. Carlton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Credit Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra L Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clerk Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?