Berry v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Chandra L. Berry
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02689
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE Regarding the Scheduling/Status Conference set 12/12/2018. Chief Magistrate Judge Vescovo informs the parties that she will discuss the issue case consolidation at the Scheduling/Status Conference. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE* (cas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter Nichols on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Nichols, Carter)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 PRO SE MOTION to Amend Complaint by Chandra L. Berry. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(jae)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 PRO SE NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Chandra L. Berry (jae)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/27/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order to ECF_Judge_Vescovo@tnwd.uscourts.gov by 12/05/2018. Reminder: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least seven days before the scheduling conference. This case requires a scheduling conference. NOTE: Revised Scheduling Order form and scheduling conference instructions on Judge Vescovo's page at www.tnwd.uscourts.gov. *TEXT NOOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton no longer assigned to case. (cas)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 11/26/2018. (Claxton, Charmiane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2018: #1 Magistrate Judicial card) (jae).
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman added. Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2018: #1 judicial assignment cards) (jae).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/14/18. (Fowlkes, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Brittingham, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Ostroff, Ethan)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Brittingham, John)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Brittingham, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from General Sessions Court of Shelby County, case number 1943336 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2897034), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Brittingham, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: John Brittingham
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Represented By: Carter Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?