Bailey et al v. Utopix Medical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: R. Sadler Bailey and Mark Miller
Defendant: Utopix Medical, LLC, David Finch, Jr., Jon Y. Yamamoto, Obsidian Solution, LLC, Barry Gilmore, Taylor Haynes and Alan Scott Goodwin
Undetermined: Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02719
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Utopix Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by David Finch, Jr, Taylor Haynes, Utopix Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law Supporting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit A - KATS Patent Application Rejection, #3 Exhibit B - KATS Patent Application, #4 Exhibit C - Auto Nurse Patent Application)(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: The Patent Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 1/2/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The parties are directed to confer before the Patent Scheduling Conference pursuant to LPR 2.1(b) and submit a Joint Planning Report and Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to LPR 2.1(c). (jrs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand The Utopix Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, proposed Order submitted, filed by David Finch, Jr, Taylor Haynes, Utopix Medical, LLC. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 and Resetting Patent Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/28/2018. (jjf)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Reset Patent Scheduling Conference re #7 Setting Letter, proposed Order submitted by David Finch, Jr, Taylor Haynes, Utopix Medical, LLC. (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand)(Yates, Stuart)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Barry Gilmore.(Washington, W.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Clark Washington on behalf of Barry Gilmore (Washington, W.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 12/7/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The parties are directed to confer before the Patent Scheduling Conference pursuant to LPR 2.1(b) and submit a Joint Planning Report and Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to LPR 2.1(c). (jrs)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Defendants Utopix Medical, L.L.C., Charles David Finch, Jr., M.D., and Taylor Hanes (to Complaint filed in Chancery Court) by David Finch, Jr, Taylor Haynes, Utopix Medical, LLC.(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr on behalf of David Finch, Jr, Taylor Haynes (Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen G. Reid, Jr on behalf of David Finch, Jr, Taylor Haynes, Utopix Medical, LLC (Reid, Glen)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Complex track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Notice of Removal of State Court Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1338, 1441, 1446 and 1454 (Federal Question, Patents) from Chancery Court of Shelby County for the Thirtieth Judicial District of Tennessee, case number CH-18-1300-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2904700), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Other Defendant Consents)(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Utopix Medical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utopix Medical, LLC
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Represented By: Glen G. Reid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Finch, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Represented By: Glen G. Reid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Y. Yamamoto
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obsidian Solution, LLC
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Gilmore
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Represented By: W. Clark Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Haynes
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Represented By: Glen G. Reid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Scott Goodwin
Represented By: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Sadler Bailey
Represented By: Stuart Baker Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Miller
Represented By: Stuart Baker Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?