Berry v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chandra L. Berry
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Corelogic Credco and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02721
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DESIGNATING CASES AS COMPANION CASES AND CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 12/12/2018. (Vescovo, Diane)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo: Status Conference held on 12/12/2018. Pro Se Plaintiff present via telephone. Counsel for the Defendants present in the Courtroom. The parties will have until 12/28/2018 to confirm the same Mediator as in case 18-2654. The Court discussed the possibility of consolidation (with 18-2689 and 18-2654) with the parties. The Court heard from the parties on the issue. After hearing from the parties the Court will consolidate the matters for discovery purposes only. The Court will enter the order. Status Conference set for 5/1/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo.(Plaintiffs Counsel: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Kavita Shelat.) (Tape #FTR) (cas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Setting. A Status Conference has been set for 12/12/2018 01:45 PM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 PRO SE MOTION to Amend Complaint by Chandra L. Berry. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(jae)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 PRO SE NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Chandra L. Berry (jae)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/9/2018. (Vescovo, Diane)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo: Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2018. Pro Se Plaintiff present. Counsel for the defendant present. Proposed Scheduling Order submitted. The Court verified the Plaintiffs contact information. The Court discussed the deadlines/date with the parties. The Court discussed case consolidation with the parties. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Kavita Shelat.)(cas)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting proposed order submitted. (Shelat, Kavita)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Shelat, Kavita)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Corelogic Credco.(Shelat, Kavita)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Setting. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/24/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 10/24/2018. (Vescovo, Diane)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Corelogic Credco, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Shelat, Kavita)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corelogic Credco, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC from General Sessions Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number 1943367 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2905701), filed by Corelogic Credco, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shelat, Kavita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Kavita Goswamy Shelat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic Credco
Represented By: Kavita Goswamy Shelat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Represented By: Kavita Goswamy Shelat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?