Akins v. U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3
Plaintiff: John Akins
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3
Undetermined: Clerk and Master Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02725
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Friday, 01/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Note, #3 Exhibit 2 - Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit 3 - Voluntary Petition, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Claim, #6 Exhibit 5 - Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Corporate Assignment)(Shelat, Kavita)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #7 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 11/02/2018. Defendants shall have up to and including November 15, 2018 to file their responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3. (Shelat, Kavita)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley E. Trammell on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3 (Trammell, Bradley)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3 from Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CH-18-1459-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2906732), filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shelat, Kavita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akins v. U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, 2006-WMC3, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3
Represented By: Kavita Goswamy Shelat
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Akins
Represented By: Curtis D. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clerk and Master Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?