Foley v. Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC

Plaintiff: Timothy Foley
Defendant: Donald T Denz, Norbert A Bennett, D&N, LLC, Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, DTD HC, LLC and Aurora Cares, LLC
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02741
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Service of Discovery (Conley, Craig)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/21/18. (Sullivan, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Status Conference is set for Monday, 5/9/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCallas chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2018. Carey Lynn Acerra appeared for the Plaintiff. Craig C. Conley appeared for the Defendant. Schedule dates tentatively accepted as submitted. Trial date left open at this time. Telephonic Status Conference is set for Thursday, 5/9/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Debi Pearce, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T Denz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig)
December 13, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Timothy Foley Notice of Service (Arnold, Deena)
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC's Rule 26 Disclosures (Conley, Craig)
December 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T Denz Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC's d/b/a Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC's REply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (DeAllaume, Ormonde)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Conley, Craig)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Timothy Foley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Acerra, Carey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ormonde Butler DeAllaume on behalf of Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (DeAllaume, Ormonde)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File **TEXT ORDER ONLY**. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/26/2018. (jjf)
November 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Conley, Craig)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Timothy Foley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Arnold, Deena)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Timothy Foley (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Timothy Foley, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Marty Lynn Ham)(Arnold, Deena)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is ADVANCED to Wednesday, 12/19/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Argument on Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/6/2018. (jjf)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 12/21/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291.(jrs)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T Denz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Conley, Craig)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003999-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2910275), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conley, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley v. Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T Denz
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert A Bennett
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&N, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allenbrooke Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Represented By: Ormonde Butler DeAllaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTD HC, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Cares, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Foley
Represented By: Austin Gardner
Represented By: Cameron C. Jehl
Represented By: Carey Lynn Acerra
Represented By: Deena Knopf Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?