Expediter Services LLC v. ES Expediting LLC
Plaintiff: Expediter Services LLC
Defendant: ES Expediting LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02758
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ES Expediting LLC. Motion terminated: #10 MOTION for Default Judgment proposed order submitted filed by Expediter Services LLC. (jae)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 MOTION for Default Judgment proposed order submitted filed by Expediter Services LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note Proper event for this document is found under >Motions>Entry of Default, not motion for default judgment. Clerk's office will issue the entry of default. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment proposed order submitted by Expediter Services LLC. (Berkowitz, Nicole)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole D. Berkowitz on behalf of Expediter Services LLC (Berkowitz, Nicole)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Expediter Services LLC as to ES Expediting LLC. (Baldridge, Adam)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ES Expediting LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons by Adam S. Baldridge on behalf of Expediter Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons (Please Issue for Private Process Service))(Baldridge, Adam)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ES Expediting LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2914102), filed by Expediter Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldridge, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expediter Services LLC v. ES Expediting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ES Expediting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expediter Services LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Represented By: Nicole D. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?