Lynn v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Eddie Lynn
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv02769
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Lynn. United States of America served on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/07/2018. U.S. Attorney served on 11/29/2018. (Chiozza, Louis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Certifcate of Good Faith, Notice of Filing Proof of Service, Affidavit of Compliance with Exhibits and Summons served on Honorable Jeff Sessions, as Attorney General on 11/07/2018, filed by Eddie Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on VA General Counsel)(Chiozza, Louis)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 General Counsel, #2 US Attorney)(jae)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by Louis P. Chiozza, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons to VA General Counsel, #2 Summons to U.S. Attorney for Western District of TN)(Chiozza, Louis)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2917842), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Faith, #4 Exhibit Notice of Compliance, #5 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to VA General Counsel Nashville, #6 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to U.S. Atty General Jeff Sessions, #7 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to VA General Counsel in D.C., #8 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to U.S. Atty Memphis, #9 Exhibit 60 day NOI letter to Memphis VAMC)(Chiozza, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lynn
Represented By: Louis P. Chiozza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?