Scott v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Dashon Scott
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02783
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dashon Scott as to US Attorney D. Michael Dunavant. (Wages, A.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Dashon Scott as to U.S. Attorney. (Wages, A.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 Summons RE-Issued as to U.S. Attorney. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons by A. Wilson Wages on behalf of Dashon Scott. (Wages, A.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 *REFILED AT #12 * NOTICE of Summons by A. Wilson Wages on behalf of Dashon Scott. (Wages, A.) *Modified on 1/3/2019 (jae).
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to the US Attorney Western District of Tennessee the filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons by A. Wilson Wages on behalf of Dashon Scott. (Wages, A.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Dashon Scott as to D. Michael Dunavant. (Wages, A.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dashon Scott as to Office of Regional Counsel, Region VII. (Wages, A.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dashon Scott as to US Department of Justice. (Wages, A.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Dept of Justice, #2 US Attorney)(jae)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Dashon Scott has been filed. For future reference, please note: Civil cover sheet contains wet signature, but should have been electronically signed by counsel. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dashon Scott (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CTNWDC-2923156), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Wages, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dashon Scott
Represented By: A. Wilson Wages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?