Pacific Mercantile Bank v. Chinn et al

Appellee: Bettye Bedwell and Larry Parke Chinn
Appellant: Pacific Mercantile Bank
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 2:2018cv02791
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Bettye Bedwell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Bailey, James)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #19 MOTION Declaration in Support of Motion to Extend Time re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Pacific Mercantile Bank has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filers should not use the event "Motion" unless the document is actually a motion. Filers should use the "search" icon or contact the help desk if unsure of what event to use. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION Declaration in Support of Motion to Extend Time re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Appellee's Brief Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Memo in Support Thereof (proposed order submitted) Declaration of Henry C. Shelton in Support of Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief by Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Appellee's Brief Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Memo in Support Thereof (proposed order submitted) by Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Pacific Mercantile Bank has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to make the notation "Proposed Order Submitted". If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Reply and Memorandum in Support by Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION Supplement the Record Motion to Supplement the Record and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Bettye Bedwell, Larry Parke Chinn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Joint Response in Opposition to Motion to Supplmeent the Record)(Bailey, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 Appellee's BRIEF by Larry Parke Chinn. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/24/2018. (Coury, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Appellee's BRIEF by Bettye Bedwell. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/24/2018. (Bailey, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION Supplement the Record Motion to Supplement the Record and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Appellant's BRIEF by Pacific Mercantile Bank. Appellee Brief due by 12/26/2018. (Shelton, Henry)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appellee designation of record (Attachments: #1 Additional items to be included in record on appeal)(jae)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Bailey, III on behalf of Bettye Bedwell (Bailey, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jeb Bailey. (jae)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appellant Designation of Record to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee (Attachments: #1 Pacific Mercantile Bank's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8009)(csf)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/20/2018. (shl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Memo in Support Thereof- proposed order submitted by Pacific Mercantile Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2018. (csf)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-30912. File received, filed by Pacific Mercantile Bank. Appellant Brief due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Mercantile Bank v. Chinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bettye Bedwell
Represented By: Jeb Bailey
Represented By: James E. Bailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry Parke Chinn
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pacific Mercantile Bank
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?