Jones v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jannie Jones
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Southeast Financial Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2018cv02814
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
1 Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Information Services, LLC for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Yoakum, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Yoakum, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Poling, Colin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for Thursday, 2/28/2019 at *3:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (*TIME CHANGE ONLY). Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. A Joint Proposed Scheduling Order shall be submitted to the Court's e-mail box 7 DAYS prior to the scheduling conference. E-mail address: ECF_Judge_McCalla@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Submission and approval of the Proposed Scheduling Order WILL NOT cancel the conference. (jpw)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 2/28/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291.(jrs)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/8/19. (Sullivan, Daniel) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED**]
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2961078) by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (State of Indiana), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (USDC, SD))(Poling, Colin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Southeast Financial Credit Union. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Jannie Jones has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: S/signature missing from the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. 11/28/2018 (jld).
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2934671), filed by Jannie Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lafferty, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian L. Yoakum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Colin C. Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Financial Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannie Jones
Represented By: Susan Sheperd Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?